EP3205760 - DOUBLE BED WARP KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/33] | WARP KNITTING MACHINE | ||
[2017/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Mayer Textilmaschinenfabrik GmbH Brühlstrasse 25 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ott, Markus Potsdamer Str. 18 63110 Rodgau / DE | 02 /
Sandmann, Rolf Weinbergstr. 25 63073 Offenbach / DE | 03 /
Flick, Oliver Otto-Hahn-Straße 4 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | 04 /
Oelstrom, Sebastian Untergasse 49 61184 Karben / DE | 05 /
List, Jürgen Eduard-Müller-Str. 9 64839 Münster b. Dieburg / DE | 06 /
Ries, Matthias Richard-Wagner-Str. 19 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 07 /
Etges, Gerhard Laakirchener Str. 52 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 16154975.3 | 10.02.2016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205760 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205760 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/08 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
D04B27/08 (EP,KR);
D04B27/24 (CN);
D04B35/00 (KR);
D04B35/28 (EP);
D04B35/30 (EP);
D04B37/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELFONTURIGE KETTENWIRKMASCHINE | [2017/40] | English: | DOUBLE BED WARP KNITTING MACHINE | [2017/40] | French: | MÉTIER À TRICOTER À CHAÎNE DOUBLE FONTURE | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/33] | KETTENWIRKMASCHINE | ||
Former [2017/33] | WARP KNITTING MACHINE | ||
Former [2017/33] | MÉTIER À TRICOTER À CHAÎNE | Examination procedure | 10.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 18.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2016 | AL | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | MT | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 10.02.2016 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.02.2016 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE19962143 (CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHIN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,10 * column 2, lines 8-13 * * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-4 * * abstract * [A] 6 [I] 8,9; | [XAI]DE10243398 (CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHIN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 6 [I] 9; | [A]DE1908149 (GUESKEN FA J) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 2 - line 4; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1840253 (SANTONI & C SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102012000309 (MAYER TEXTILMASCHF [DE]) [A] 10 * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * |