Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102304693B | Global Dossier | 28.09.2021 | B1 | KR20160099435 | 22.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150021744 | 12.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10536637 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2020 | B2 | US2016241784 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150021744 | 12.02.2015 | KR20150030030 | 03.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105893078B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2021 | B | CN105893078 | 24.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150021744 | 12.02.2015 | KR20150030030 | 03.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3057309 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | B1 | EP3057309 | 17.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150021744 | 12.02.2015 | KR20150030030 | 03.03.2015 |