EP3205965 - ADAPTATION OF ROTATING FURNACE FORMS TO TARGET FORMS IN ROTATING FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalkert, Peter Kreuzstrasse 61 52428 Jülich / DE | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalkert, Peter, Dr. Kreuzstrasse 61 52428 Jülich / DE | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Metzgerstraße 61 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Philipsstrasse 8 52068 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16155363.1 | 11.02.2016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205965 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/38, F27B7/42, F27D9/00, F27D19/00, F27D21/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
F27B7/386 (EP);
F27B7/42 (EP);
F27D2009/0016 (EP);
F27D2019/0056 (EP);
F27D2021/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG VON DREHOFENFORMEN AN SOLL-FORMEN BEI DREHÖFEN | [2017/33] | English: | ADAPTATION OF ROTATING FURNACE FORMS TO TARGET FORMS IN ROTATING FURNACES | [2017/33] | French: | ADAPTATION DE FORMES DE FOUR ROTATIF SUR DES FORMES THEORIQUES POUR FOURS ROTATIFS | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2947409 (KIMA ECHTZEITSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * claims 1-15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2014185788 (UBE INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 7 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]FR2619897 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |