EP3073022 - NESTING TILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edilians 65 chemin du Moulin Carron 69570 Dardilly / FR | [2019/12] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Imerys TC Parc d'Activités de Limonest 1, rue des Vergers - Silic 3 69760 Limonest / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINAT, Eric 340 rue des Alouettes 01600 TREVOUX / FR | 02 /
DUBOST, Daniel 20 route de l'Argentière 69610 SAINTE FOY L'ARGENTIERE / FR | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 16156108.9 | 17.02.2016 | [2016/39] | Priority number, date | FR20150052453 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: FR 1552453 | [2016/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073022 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3073022 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/02, E04D1/04, E04D1/12, E04D1/16 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
E04D1/04 (EP);
E04D1/2918 (EP,US);
E04D1/02 (EP,US);
E04D1/12 (EP,US);
E04D1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DACHZIEGEL MIT STECKVERBINDUNG | [2016/39] | English: | NESTING TILE | [2016/39] | French: | TUILE À EMBOITEMENT | [2016/39] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2016 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 17.02.2020 | LU | 17.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.02.2016 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4226070 (ARAGON ROBERT C) [A] 11,14,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2592082 (ANSAULT PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 6 *; | [XI]DE8708244U (SEGL, THEO) [X] 1,2,7,13 * figures 1-2,9-10 * [I] 3; | [A]FR2604467 (CMPR [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4; claim 4 *; | [XI]JPS6452947 (KOSUMITSUKU KK) [X] 1,2,4,13 * figures 28-36 * [I] 3,9; | [A]US5490360 (FIFIELD JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1,9,16 *; | [A]CN2260123Y (YANG YAOQI [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,5,7 *; | [A]FR2760479 (GAAL ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3-6 *; | [XI]FR2842554 (IMERYS TOITURE [FR]) [X] 1-8,12 * figures 3,6 * [I] 10 |