EP3065224 - LEVEL CONNECTION TERMINAL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janzen, Wjatscheslaw Karl-Wehrhan-Str.166 32758 Detmold / DE | 02 /
Hoemann, Norbert Am Ring 5 33034 Brakel / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Janke, Christiane Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, Licenses & Standards Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16156225.1 | 18.02.2016 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | DE201510103259 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015103259 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065224 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3065224 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H01R9/2683 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ETAGENANSCHLUSSKLEMMENANORDNUNG | [2016/36] | English: | LEVEL CONNECTION TERMINAL ASSEMBLY | [2016/36] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE BORNE DE CONNEXION ÉTAGÉE | [2017/36] |
Former [2016/36] | AGENCEMENT DE BORNE DE CONNEXION ETAGE | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2016 | AL | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | MT | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | RS | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | IE | 18.02.2018 | LU | 18.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 18.02.2016 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102006053352 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0023] , [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3524658 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, lines 49-62; figures 2, 4 * * figures 2, 4 *; | [Y]DE202009002158U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]DE2320867 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |