EP3050582 - IMPROVED FLEXIBLE REDUCED PRESSURE TREATMENT APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlueSky Medical Group Incorporated 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTON, Richard, Scott 2852 Cacatua Street Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 16156316.8 | 19.05.2005 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | US20040573655P | 21.05.2004 Original published format: US 573655 P | US20050064813 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: US 64813 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050582 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61F13/00, A61F15/00, A61M27/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61M1/74 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (US);
A61M1/80 (US);
A61M1/98 (EP,US);
A61M1/60 (EP,US);
A61M1/682 (EP,US);
A61M2205/075 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (US);
A61M2205/75 (US);
A61M39/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | DE, GB | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE FLEXIBLE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG MIT VERMINDERTEM DRUCK | [2016/31] | English: | IMPROVED FLEXIBLE REDUCED PRESSURE TREATMENT APPLIANCE | [2016/31] | French: | APPAREIL FLEXIBLE AMÉLIORÉ DE TRAITEMENT À PRESSION RÉDUITE | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05750239.5 / EP1755701 | EP11154569.5 / EP2329855 | Divisional application(s) | EP17169314.6 / EP3235524 | EP17169320.3 / EP3246054 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19844355 (SACHSE RAINER E [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03073970 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 3 * * page 6, line 3 - page 12, line 13 *; | [X]US2004030304 (HUNT KENNETH [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US2004073151 (WESTON RICHARD SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 ** paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]WO2004037334 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * page 50, line 33 - page 59, line 5 *; | [E]WO2005051461 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [E] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * page 41, line 35 - page 45, line 9 * | by applicant | US4969880 | US5636643 | US5645081 | US2002019503 | US2002019504 | US2002065494 | US2002068913 | US2002161346 | US2002183702 | US2003040687 | US2003050594 | US20030652100 | US20040026733 |