EP3110157 - STREAMING MEDIA PRESENTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNETT, John Samuel c/o Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | 02 /
DICKENS, Joshua Barton c/o Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16156553.6 | 19.02.2016 | [2016/52] | Priority number, date | US201562183612P | 23.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562183612 P | US201514964333 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: US201514964333 | WO2015US65066 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/065066 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3110157 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3110157 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2187, H04N21/24, H04N21/2743, H04N21/4788 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H04N21/252 (EP);
H04N21/2187 (EP);
H04N21/2743 (EP);
H04N21/43079 (EP);
H04N21/4788 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STREAMING-MEDIEN-PRÄSENTATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/52] | English: | STREAMING MEDIA PRESENTATION SYSTEM | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉSENTATION DE MÉDIAS EN CONTINU | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 06.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2021 | 23.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | 31.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP22156021.2 / EP4020997 | EP22156100.4 / EP4024873 | EP22156245.7 / EP4033768 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005262530 (RUETSCHI JOHANNES [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] *; | [Y]US2013103814 (CARRASCO ELIZABETH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; figure 8 *; | [YA]US2015002688 (BALDWIN JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *[A] 1-7,10-13; | [XY]US2015020106 (BELYAEV LEONID [RU], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 7,9 | by applicant | US20060503093 | US20100977027 | US20100978265 |