EP3050694 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FUEL TANK PROVIDED WITH INTERNAL ACCESSORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de la Fusée, 98-100 1130 Bruxelles / BE | [2019/35] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRIEL, Bjorn Steenbergstraat 11A 1750 SINT-MARTENS-LENNIK / BE | 02 /
WALLING, Nadja 50, rue Saint-Martin 60280 MARGNY-LES-COMPIEGNE / FR | 03 /
LABORDE, Fabrice Résidence Parc des saisons - B02 4, impasse René Cabau 31200 TOULOUSE / FR | 04 /
LEMOINE, Hervé 7, rue de Nervaise 60170 TRACY LE MONT / FR | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Monni, Richard Cabinet LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 16156558.5 | 27.06.2006 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | FR20050006574 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506574 | FR20050008707 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508707 | FR20060001018 | 03.02.2006 Original published format: FR 0601018 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050694 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050694 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/20, B29C51/12 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B29C49/20 (EP,KR,US);
B29D22/003 (KR,US);
B21J15/02 (KR,US);
B29C48/0017 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/0691 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/16 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/4247 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/62 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/6464 (EP,KR);
B29C49/6465 (EP,KR);
B29C49/6466 (EP,KR);
B29C51/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/267 (EP,KR,US);
B29C51/428 (EP,KR,US);
B60K15/03 (KR,US);
B29C2049/2008 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2073 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/2095 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2049/4881 (EP,KR);
B29C2791/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2791/007 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2793/0063 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2023/065 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KRAFTSTOFFTANKS MIT EINLEGETEILEN | [2016/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FUEL TANK PROVIDED WITH INTERNAL ACCESSORIES | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN RÉSERVOIR À CARBURANT AVEC INSERTS | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 02.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06777484.4 / EP1910057 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2006 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | GB | 27.06.2019 | IE | 27.06.2019 | LU | 27.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2494176 (ELBATAINER KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19600872 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 31 - line 36; figure 1; claim 8 *; | [XI]DE10010900 (KRETH LUDWIG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 2, line 34 - line 50 * * column 3, line 42 - line 44 * * column 4, line 2 - line 6 * * column 4, line 11 - line 12 * * column 4, line 50 - line 66; figure 1; claims 1,2,4,12 * [I] 5,10; | [A]US2003047563 (REINELT GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO2004031044 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 12; figure 1 *; | [AP]FR2879122 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE]) [AP] 1* figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | GB1410215 | EP1110697 | FR20040013407 |