EP3067595 - VALVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murrplastik Produktionstechnik GmbH Kanalstraße 8 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Rheinstraße 19 76532 Baden-Baden / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 16156638.5 | 22.02.2016 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | DE20151003055 | 11.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015003055 | [2016/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067595 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/20, F16K5/04, F16K5/18 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
F16K5/184 (EP);
F16K1/2057 (EP);
F16K5/0428 (EP);
F16K5/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILEINHEIT | [2016/37] | English: | VALVE UNIT | [2016/37] | French: | UNITÉ DE SOUPAPE | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0517547 (WILLIAMS RICHARD T [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-5 * [A] 9 [I] 4,5; | [X]DE29914869U (RANCO INC OF DELAWARE WILMINGT [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10052327 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0041]; figures 6-8 *; | [X]DE1600836 (KRAUSS MAFFEI IMP GMBH) [X] 1,3-6 * page 3; figure - *; | [X]EP2314900 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017]; figure - *; | [X]US2006214017 (VACCA FREDERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045]; figures 4-7 * | by applicant | DE4416039 |