EP3072979 - METHANOTHERMOBACTER THERMAUTOTROPHICUS STRAIN AND VARIANTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METS, Laurens 417 N. Canal Street Chicago, IL 60654 / US | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16156757.3 | 05.01.2012 | [2016/39] | Priority number, date | US201161430071P | 05.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161430071 P | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3072979 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3072979 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12R1/01, C12P5/02 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
C12P5/023 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12N13/00 (US);
C12N15/01 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | METHANOTHERMOBACTER-THERMAUTOTROPHICUS-STAMM UND VARIANTEN DAVON | [2016/39] | English: | METHANOTHERMOBACTER THERMAUTOTROPHICUS STRAIN AND VARIANTS THEREOF | [2016/39] | French: | SOUCHE DE METHANOTHERMOBACTER THERMAUTOTROPHICUS ET SES VARIANTES | [2016/39] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Observations by third parties | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2020 | 30.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12701286.2 / EP2661511 | Divisional application(s) | EP20216725.0 / EP3865593 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | TR | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 24.02.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0332134 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, lines 18-23, 45-47; figure 1; example 1 *; | [IP]WO2011003081 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [IP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0097] - [0098] - [0105] - [0106] - [0112] , [0176] - [0178]; example 1; claims 1-3,12,19 *; | [IP]US2011165667 (METS LAURENS [US]) [IP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0053] , [0100] , [0116] , [0139] , [0192] - [0215] - [0224] - [0236] - [0241] - [0242] - [0249] - [0253]; examples 1,3-5; claims 1,14 *; | [YP]US2011281333 (BROWN PAUL W [US], et al) [YP] 1-15* paragraphs [0051] , [0076] - [0078]; claims 1,2,4,13,18 *; | [YD] - N. SCHILL ET AL, "Continuous cultures limited by a gaseous substrate: Development of a simple, unstructured mathematical model and experimental verification with Methanobacterium thermoautotrophicum", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19960920), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19960920)51:6<645::AID-BIT4>3.0.CO;2-H, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 645 - 658, XP055028996 [YD] 1-15 * page 648, column r, lines 15-38; table IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19960920)51:6<645::AID-BIT4>3.0.CO;2-H | [Y] - CHANDRESH D THAKKER ET AL, "An alkalophilic Methanosarcina isolated from Lonar crater", CURRENT SCIENCE, (20020225), vol. 82, no. 4, pages 455 - 458, XP055290481 [Y] 1-15 * page 456, column l, paragraph 2 * | Examination | - ZEIKUS J.G., WOLFE, R.S., "Methanobacterium thermoautotrophicus sp. n., an anaerobic, autotrophic, extreme thermophile", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (19720201), vol. 109, no. 2, pages 707 - 713 | - KATO S., KOSAKA T., WATANABE K., "Comparative transcriptome analysis of responses of Methanothermobacter thermautotrophicus to different environmental stimuli", ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20071125), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1462-2920.2007.01508.x, pages 893 - 905 | by applicant | US6033506 | US2006257985 | US2009130734 | - REEVE ET AL., J ACTEIIOL, (1997), vol. 179, pages 5975 - 5986 | - WASSERFALLEN ET AL., INTERNATL J SYSTEMATIC EVOL BIOL, (2000), vol. 50, pages 43 - 53 | - BRYANT ET AL., ARCHIV MICROBIOL, (1967), vol. 59, pages 20 - 31 | - BAE, B.; K MIYATAKE; M. WATANABE, MACROMOLECULES, (2010), vol. 43, pages 2684 - 2691 | - G.-B. JUNG ET AL., J FUEL CELL TECHNOL, (2007), vol. 4, pages 248 - 255 | - HU, L. ET AL., PROC NAT ACAD SCI USA, (2009), vol. 106, pages 21490 - 4 | - IIJIMA, S., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, page 56 | - WANG, J. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 2408 - 2409 | - JIANG, P., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (2004), vol. 43, pages 4471 - 4475 | - SCHILL ET AL., BIOTECH BIOENG, (1996), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 645 - 658 | - BALCH, W.E.; R.S. WOLFE, "New approach to the cultivation of methanogenic bacteria: 2-mercaptoethanesulfonic acid (HS-CoM)-dependent growth of Methanobacterium ruminantium in a pressurized atmosphere", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1976), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 781 - 91 | - MUKHOPADHYAY, B.; E.F. JOHNSON; R.S. WOLFE, "Reactor-scale cultivation of the hyperthermophilic methanarchaeon Methanococcus jannaschii to high cell densities", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1999), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 5059 - 65 | - KIENER, A.; T. LEISINGER, "Oxygen Sensitivity ofMethanogenic Bacteria", SYSTEMATIC AND APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 305 - 312 | WO2010US40944 |