EP3107316 - BROADCASTING PAIRING SIGNAL AND RESPONDING TO IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAYAMA, Yoichi c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
ASO, Asami c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Toshihiko c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 04 /
KAWAKAMI, Gou c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 05 /
KAWAHARA, Kazuma c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 06 /
KAWASHIMO, Takashi c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 16157496.7 | 26.02.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | JP20150120655 | 15.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015120655 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107316 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W84/18 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0253 (CN);
G06Q30/0261 (CN);
G06Q30/0267 (CN);
G06Q30/0269 (CN);
H04L67/52 (CN);
H04L67/55 (CN);
H04M1/72412 (CN);
H04W12/06 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSENDEN EINES PAIRING SIGNALS UND ANTWORT DARAUF | [2016/51] | English: | BROADCASTING PAIRING SIGNAL AND RESPONDING TO IT | [2016/51] | French: | EMISSION D'UN SIGNAL DE COUPLAGE ET RÉPONSE CORRESPONDANTE | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 26.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014342670 (KANG HYUK [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,9,10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0189] * * paragraph [0308] - paragraph [0359] * * paragraph [0369] - paragraph [0426] * * paragraph [0434] - paragraph [0451]; figures 1-6,21-24B,26-28,30; claims 1-13,25,27 * [I] 2-4,6-8; | [I]WO2015044677 (BLUE SYNC LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 3 - page 7, line 2 * * page 9, line 11 - page 16, line 25 * * page 23, line 15 - page 25, line 19 * * page 27, line 13 - page 27, line 19 * * page 28, line 33 - page 31, line 9; figures 1-3B,6,7,12; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2015099467 (KANG HYUK [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0066] ** paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0130]; figures 1-5,10,11; claims 1-7 *; | [A] - Adam Warski, "How do iBeacons work?", (20140113), URL: http://www.warski.org/blog/2014/01/how-ibeacons-work/, (20160405), XP002756110 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - Bluetooth Special Interest Group (SIG), "Specification of the Bluetooth System, Specification Volume 6", (20100630), pages 2165 - 2300, URL: https://www.bluetooth.com/specifications/bluetooth-core-specification, (20120112), XP055016390 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009060526 |