Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3136217
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.03.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
10.12.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
16.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.10.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
01.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|