Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9402438 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2011232133 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113152401 | 03.06.2011 | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010504839 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US79617 | 27.09.2007 | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2066193 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B1 | EP2066193 | 27.07.2011 | A4 | EP2066193 | 10.06.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US79617 | 27.09.2007 | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3130246 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B1 | EP3130246 | 15.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07843278 | 27.09.2007 | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1131732 | 05.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US79617 | 27.09.2007 | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008039883 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2008 | A3 | WO2008039883 | 03.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7954261 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2008072457 | 27.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86174507 | 26.09.2007 | US82716806 | 27.09.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP2066193 |