EP3214223 - ROAD FINISHER WITH LATERAL OPERATING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Joseph-Vögele-Straße 1 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHMANN, Martin Johanniterstraße 7 67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
EUL, Achim Soldatenweg 129 68305 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
OETTINGER, Klaus Kurpfalzstraße 22 68804 Altlußheim / DE | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 16158709.2 | 04.03.2016 | [2017/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214223 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3214223 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/48 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
E01C19/48 (EP,US);
E01C19/12 (CN);
E01C19/4873 (US);
B60Q1/02 (US);
B60Q3/40 (US);
E01C19/30 (CN);
G07C5/0808 (US);
G07C5/0841 (US);
E01C2301/30 (US);
E01C2301/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRASSENFERTIGER MIT SEITLICHER BEDIENEINHEIT | [2017/36] | English: | ROAD FINISHER WITH LATERAL OPERATING UNIT | [2017/36] | French: | FINISSEUSE DE ROUTE COMPRENANT UNE UNITE DE COMMANDE LATERALE | [2017/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2016 | AL | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 04.03.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 04.03.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9204559U ; | [X]DE29609704U (JOSEPH VOEGELE AG [DE]); | [X]DE102005040326 (CATERPILLAR PAVING PROD [US]); | [X]EP2119831 (JOSEPH VOEGELE AG [DE]) |