EP3065283 - INTEGRATED POWER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd. Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Moulsoe Road Cranfield Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URQUHART, Iain Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | 02 /
GREENOUGH, Jim Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16158968.4 | 07.03.2016 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | GB20150003806 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: GB 201503806 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065283 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00, H05K7/00, H05K7/14, H05K7/20 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H05K7/20927 (EP,US);
H02M1/126 (EP);
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/33576 (EP);
H02M7/003 (EP);
H05K7/14322 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 07.03.2017 | ME | 07.03.2017 | Validation states | MA | 07.03.2017 | MD | 07.03.2017 | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES LEISTUNGSMODUL | [2016/36] | English: | INTEGRATED POWER MODULE | [2016/36] | French: | MODULE DE PUISSANCE INTÉGRÉ | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003132041 (BEIHOFF BRUCE C [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0110]; figures 1-14,30c,34; claims 1-4,6-14 *; | [XA]EP2150098 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1,3,7 *[A] 16; | [X]EP2180776 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,2,4,6-10; claims 1,2,6,8,12-17 *; | [XA]US2011168476 (HURMER PAUL [DE]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,3,5; claims 1,3,4 * [A] 10-13,16; | [XA]US2012008286 (SUZUKI HIDEYO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0074]; figures 5,6,8,9; claims 1,2 * [A] 16; | [X]WO2013065472 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [XA]EP2738930 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,14,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1,3-6,15,16 * [A] 8,10-13,16 |