EP3216510 - A PARTICULATE EARTH ALKALI CARBONATE-COMPRISING MATERIAL FOR NOX UPTAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPORTE, Christophe En Bouley 62 1680 Romont / CH | 02 /
FREY, Daniel Klösterligasse 2 4800 Zofingen / CH | 03 /
HETTMANN, Kai Max Serrnussweg 1 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 04 /
RENTSCH, Samuel Gurtengartenstrasse 1 3095 Spiegel bei Bern / CH | 05 /
GYSAU, Detlef Schybenächerweg 565 5324 Full / CH | 06 /
GANE, Patrick A. C. Studenweg 8 4852 Rothrist / CH | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Boos, Melanie Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Boos, Melanie Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16158979.1 | 07.03.2016 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216510 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01J20/28, B01D15/00, B01J20/04, B01D53/56, B01J20/30 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,KR,RU);
B01D53/565 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01D15/00 (EP,KR,RU);
B01J20/043 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01J20/048 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01J20/28059 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01J20/28061 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01J20/3071 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C02F1/281 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01D2251/40 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/404 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2251/604 (US);
B01D2251/606 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2251/61 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/306 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/402 (US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,KR);
C02F2101/163 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2101/166 (EP,KR,US);
Y02C20/10 (EP,KR);
Y02W10/37 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | 07.03.2016 | ME | 07.03.2016 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILCHENFÖRMIGES ERDALKALIKARBONATHALTIGES MATERIAL ZUR AUFNAHME VON NOX | [2017/37] | English: | A PARTICULATE EARTH ALKALI CARBONATE-COMPRISING MATERIAL FOR NOX UPTAKE | [2017/37] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPRENANT UN CARBONATE ALCALINO-TERREUX PARTICULAIRE POUR L'ABSORPTION DES OXYDES D'AZOTE | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 07.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07196314 (MARUO CALCIUM) [X] 14,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0015] , [0017] - [0019] - [0023] - [0033]; claims 1-10 *; | [XI]JPH11290694 (MARUO CALCIUM) [X] 1,3,5,10,14-17 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0019] * [I] 4; | [X]JP3113903B (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN; RIKEN KK) [X] 1-5,9,14-17 * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1; claim 1 *; | [I]JP2001232206 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN, et al) [I] 1-10,14-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] , [0017] , [0021] , [0023] *; | [XY]JP2003063852 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [X] 1-5,10,14-17 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0016]; claims 4,6 * [Y] 10; | [Y]EP1645322 (NISHIMATSU CONSTR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * paragraphs [0036] , [0040] - [0042] *; | [XI]JP2010172790 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,2 *[I] 4; | [X]JP2011041924 (DENSO CORP, et al) [X] 1-7,14-17 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,6 *; | [XI]US2012165236 (NAKAMURA SHOICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,10,14-17 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0027] , [0038]; figure 1; claims 1-6 * [I] 7; | [X]JP2013146693 (NE CHEMCAT CORP) [X] 1-5,14-17 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] - [0034] - [0039]; examples 1-2 *; | [XY]WO2015044659 (T & L SUGARS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9,14-17 * claims 1,2,9,18,19,22 * [Y] 10-13 | by applicant | JPH07223813 | WO0039222 | US6136186 | US2004020410 | WO2004083316 | EP1559753 | WO2005121257 | WO2006000565 | WO2009074492 | EP2264108 | EP2264109 | - GANE, P.A.C.; KETTLE, J.P.; MATTHEWS, G.P.; RIDGWAY, C.J., "Void Space Structure of Compressible Polymer Spheres and Consolidated Calcium Carbonate Paper-Coating Formulations", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1753 - 1764 |