EP3067008 - DENTAL OR SURGICAL HANDPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SycoTec GmbH & Co. KG Wangener Strasse 78 88299 Leutkirch im Allgäu / DE | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Rickert, Martin St.-Nikolaus-Weg 6 88410 Bad Wurzach-Haidgau / DE | 02 /
Rickert, Carolin St.-Nikolaus-Weg 6 88410 Bad Wurzach-Haidgau / DE | 03 /
Mack, Karl Am Fuchsberg 4 87452 Altusried / DE | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht, Buchhold, Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Pfister & Pfister Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16159437.9 | 09.03.2016 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | DE201510103432 | 09.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015103432 | DE201510111757 | 20.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015111757 | [2016/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067008 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3067008 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/12, A61B17/16, A61C1/06 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/1622 (EP,US);
A61C1/0061 (EP,US);
A61C1/088 (EP,US);
A61C1/12 (EP,US);
A61C1/141 (EP,US);
A61C17/0202 (US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3614 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DENTALES ODER CHIRURGISCHES HANDSTÜCK | [2016/37] | English: | DENTAL OR SURGICAL HANDPIECE | [2016/37] | French: | PIÈCE À MAIN CHIRURGICALE OU DENTAIRE | [2017/18] |
Former [2016/37] | PIECE A MAIN CHIRURGICALE OU DENTAIRE | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 06.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2016 | AL | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | IT | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | MT | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 09.03.2018 | LU | 09.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.03.2016 | |
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2514386 (W & H DENTALWERK BUERMOOS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 ** paragraph [0019] *; | [A]EP2581061 (W & H DENTALWERK BUERMOOS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 35] , [0 36] * |