EP3093438 - AIRFOIL WITH AN IMPINGEMENT CAVITY AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF MAKING AN AIRFOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/46] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Scott D. 9 Grandview Terrace Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | 02 /
CORCORAN, Christopher 28 Colgate Drive Manchester, CT Connecticut 06042 / US | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16159940.2 | 11.03.2016 | [2016/46] | Priority number, date | US201514710397 | 12.05.2015 Original published format: US201514710397 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3093438 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2250/11 (EP,US);
F05D2250/13 (EP,US);
F05D2250/14 (EP,US);
F05D2250/141 (EP,US);
F05D2250/183 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2016/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAUFEL MIT PRALLHOHLRAUM UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/46] | English: | AIRFOIL WITH AN IMPINGEMENT CAVITY AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF MAKING AN AIRFOIL | [2016/46] | French: | AUBE AYANT UNE CAVITÉ D'IMPACT AÉRODYNAMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2016/46] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/21] | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US8070442 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,12,14,15 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 24 * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [XYI]US2010034638 (CHAMBERS ANDREW [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,12,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, paragraph [0015] - page 2, paragraph [0025] * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [XYI]US2009047136 (CHON YOUNG H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10-12,14 * figures 1, 2, 3, 6 * * page 1, paragraph [0012] - page 3, paragraph [0021] * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [XYI]US2010143153 (GROSS HEINZ-JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,3,8,10,11,14 * figures 1, 2 * * page 3, paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [XYI]US8070443 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,4,8,10,14 * figures 2, 3 * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 44 * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [XYI]US2004219016 (DEMERS DANIEL EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10,12,14 * figures 1-4 * * page 2, paragraph [0020] - page 3, paragraph [0033] * [Y] 9 [I] 13; | [Y]US2010254824 (NAIK SHAILENDRA [CH], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 1-6 * |