EP3216861 - IMMUNOREGULATORY CELLS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fropharm GmbH Flughafenstrasse 52 B 22335 Hamburg / DE | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISSLER, Edward K. Kastanienweg 14 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, James A. Bischof-Konrad-Straße 2a 93051 Regensburg / DE | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 16159985.7 | 11.03.2016 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216861 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0786 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
C12N5/0645 (EP,US);
A61K2239/26 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4614 (EP,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/46434 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C12N2501/22 (EP,US);
C12N2501/24 (EP,US);
C12N2501/599 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNREGULIERENDE ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2017/37] | English: | IMMUNOREGULATORY CELLS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION | [2017/37] | French: | CELLULES IMMUNORÉGULATRICES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015048641 (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]); |