EP3098733 - LOGGING EVENTS WITH TIMESTAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House, Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2020/03] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House, Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murrin, Paul Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Station Road Chepstow, NP16 5PB / GB | 02 /
Davies, Gareth Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2020/03] |
Former [2016/48] | Wright, Nicholas Donald, et al Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Herts WD4 8LZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16160332.9 | 15.03.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | GB20150004975 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: GB 201504975 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098733 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3098733 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/40, // G06F11/34 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06F11/3636 (EP,US);
G06F11/3086 (CN);
G06F11/3476 (EP,GB,US);
G06F17/40 (EP,US);
G06F11/3466 (EP,US);
G06F2201/835 (EP,US);
G06F2201/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2017/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROTOKOLLIERUNG VON EREIGNISSEN MIT ZEITSTEMPELN | [2016/48] | English: | LOGGING EVENTS WITH TIMESTAMPS | [2016/48] | French: | ÉVÉNEMENTS DE JOURNAL AVEC HORODATAGE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2016 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | IE | 15.03.2020 | LU | 15.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015082325 (AHARONOV ARSENIY [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] *; | [XI] - JOHAN KRAFT ET AL, Trace Recording for Embedded Systems: Lessons Learned from Five Industrial Projects, RUNTIME VERIFICATION, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 315 - 329, (20101101), ISBN 978-3-642-16611-2, XP019156250 [X] 1-6,9,12-15 * abstract * * sections 2.1-2.3, 4.1, 4.3 * [I] 7,8,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-16612-9_24 | [XI] - ORIOL ARCAS ET AL, "A Low-Overhead Profiling and Visualization Framework for Hybrid Transactional Memory", FIELD-PROGRAMMABLE CUSTOM COMPUTING MACHINES (FCCM), 2012 IEEE 20TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20120429), doi:10.1109/FCCM.2012.11, ISBN 978-1-4673-1605-7, pages 1 - 8, XP032202814 [X] 1-6,9,12-15 * abstract * * section III.A * [I] 7,8,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FCCM.2012.11 | [I] - BAKER K F JR ET AL, "A priority event monitor for an interrupt-driven microprocessor", PROCEEDINGS OF SOUTHEASTCON. WILLIAMSBURG, APRIL 7 - 10, 1991; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910407), vol. -, doi:10.1109/SECON.1991.147891, ISBN 978-0-7803-0033-0, pages 905 - 909, XP010045035 [I] 1-15 * section 1.2 Timestamps * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECON.1991.147891 |