EP3065002 - SAFETY ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SAFETY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMPKIN, Wayne Robert Oesterliwaldweg 2 5400 Baden / CH | 02 /
LUTZ, Norbert Am Waldfriedhof 7 90607 Rückersdorf / DE | 03 /
BURKHARDT, Markus Friedenstr. 16 a 90513 Zirndorf / DE | 04 /
SCHARFENBERG, Michael Sudermannstr. 24 Nürnberg 90455 / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16160407.9 | 02.04.2009 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | DE20081017652 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008017652 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065002 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3065002 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/04, G03H1/28, B42D25/328 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B42D25/435 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/41 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H1/041 (EP,US);
G03H1/28 (EP,US);
G03H1/0236 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0415 (EP,US);
G03H2001/187 (EP,US);
G03H2001/188 (EP,US);
G03H2001/207 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2635 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2016/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SICHERHEITSELEMENTS | [2016/36] | English: | SAFETY ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SAFETY ELEMENT | [2016/36] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09726915.3 / EP2265999 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2009 | CY | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | NL | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | IE | 02.04.2021 | LU | 02.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 02.04.2009 | |
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 07.10.2020 | |
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 02.04.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 02.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2232927 (HEWITT BRIAN STEPHEN); | [I]EP1645943 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | WO03099581 | by applicant | EP1187728 | DE102006016139 |