EP3219398 - PAINTING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PAINTING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sturm Maschinen- & Anlagenbau GmbH Industriestraße 10 94330 Salching / DE | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÖLLINGER, Ralf Rabenstrasse 72 94315 Straubing / DE | 02 /
RATZKA, Uwe Josef-Schaffner-Str. 6c 94339 Leiblfing / DE | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Simon Geiselhöringer Str. 34 84152 Mengkofen / DE | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16160744.5 | 16.03.2016 | [2017/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219398 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12, B01D46/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
B05B14/43 (EP);
B05B13/0452 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACKIERANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM LACKIEREN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2017/38] | English: | PAINTING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PAINTING A WORKPIECE | [2017/38] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PEINTURE ET PROCEDE DE PEINTURE D'UNE PIECE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202014103177U (DÜRR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-10,12-14 * §0432: Punkt 28-29; paragraphs [0285] , [0287 0314] , [ 0352] , [ 0356] , [0363] , [0432]; figures 3, 4,10; claims 5,6,14 * [I] 2,5,11; | [XI]DE102013011107 (EISENMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,13 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0048]; figures 2,3 * [I] 14; | [I]DE3406464 (LICHER HANS JOSEF) [I] 1,2,9,11 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 10; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2014121888 (EISENMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0074] - [0082]; figures 7-11 *; | [A]DE202015105378U (NEUMANN JENS [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0037] , [0070] , [0071]; figure 10 * | by applicant | DE102011108631 | DE10209499 | DE20105239U | DE102009034863 |