EP3076159 - SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A GAS MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERS, Mark Marshall General Electric Company, Global Research 1 Research Cirle Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
ROBINSON, David Peter General Electric Company, Global Research 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 03 /
MAITY, Sandip General Electric Company, Global Research 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 04 /
KOVOORI SETHUMADHAVAN, Nagapriya John F. Welch Technology Centre, Plot 122, EPIP Phase 11, Hoodi Village, Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16160980.5 | 17.03.2016 | [2016/40] | Priority number, date | US201514668099 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: US201514668099 | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076159 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, // G01N21/3504, G01J3/433 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/0009 (EP,US);
G01N21/25 (CN);
G01N21/255 (CN,US);
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01J3/433 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2016/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR DIE ANALYSE EINES GASGEMISCHS | [2016/40] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ANALYZING A GAS MIXTURE | [2016/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR ANALYSER UN MÉLANGE GAZEUX | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1070943 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 29] *; | [Y]EP1167949 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008079032 (PHOTONIC INNOVATIONS LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 12 * * page 27, line 26 - page 30, line 2 ** figures 15, 16, 17a-17c *; | [Y]US7800751 (SILVER JOEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,11,12,15 * column 1, lines 34-36 * * column 5, lines 12-17 * * column 5, lines 28-45 * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - TARSITANO C G AND WEBSTER C R, "Multilaser Herriott cell for planetary tunable laser spectrometers", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20071001), vol. 46, no. 28, doi:10.1364/AO.46.006923, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6923 - 6935, XP001508502 [Y] 11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.46.006923 |