EP3070383 - SERVO VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. u. K. Müller GmbH & Co. KG Dresdener Strasse 162 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Feder Walter Ebert Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Feder Walter Ebert Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16161087.8 | 18.03.2016 | [2016/38] | Priority number, date | DE201510104258 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015104258 | [2016/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3070383 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3070383 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/40 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
F16K31/402 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SERVOVENTIL | [2016/38] | English: | SERVO VALVE | [2016/38] | French: | SERVO-SOUPAPE | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2016 | AL | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | GR | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | IE | 18.03.2019 | LU | 18.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.03.2016 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3933747 (STAIGER STEUERUNGSTECH [DE]) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-16 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5645264 (KAH JR CARL L C [US]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * column 1, lines 3-4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2752606 (SETHA SOCIETE D ETUDES DE TRAV [FR]) [X] 1-5,10,11,14,15* figure 2 *; | [X]DE102005011951 (STAIGER STEUERUNGSTECH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,14-16 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]EP2527700 (MUELLER A & K GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP2557242 (VIEGA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-15 * column 7, paragraph 33; figure 3 * |