EP3173887 - METHOD FOR MOVING A LINEAR ACTUATOR, LINEAR ACTUATOR AND PRODUCTION OR PACKAGING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäntsch, Michael Am Röthelheim 54 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Spindler, Carsten Burglemnitz 9 07368 Remptendorf / DE | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 16161437.5 | 21.03.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | EP20150196047 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15196047 | EP20150196041 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15196041 | EP20150196077 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15196077 | [2017/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173887 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/19, B65G54/02, B23Q15/24 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
H02K41/02 (US);
B23Q15/24 (EP,US);
B65G37/00 (EP,US);
B65G37/005 (US);
B65G43/10 (EP,US);
G05B19/19 (EP,US);
H02P25/06 (US);
B65G23/23 (US);
G05B2219/41327 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41337 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50229 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWEGUNG EINES LÄUFERS, LINEARANTRIEB UND PRODUKTION- ODER VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE | [2017/22] | English: | METHOD FOR MOVING A LINEAR ACTUATOR, LINEAR ACTUATOR AND PRODUCTION OR PACKAGING MACHINE | [2017/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLACEMENT D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT LINÉAIRE, ENTRAÎNEMENT LINÉAIRE ET MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE OU DE PRODUCTION | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0409190 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-5,12,13,15-19 * column 7, line 27 - column 1140; figures 1,6,7 *; | [X]DE102008008602 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,12,13,15-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2141019 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 6-11,14* paragraphs [0021] - [0003] - [0051]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102012025326 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 6-11,14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2015071228 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,12,13,15-19 * page 5; figure 1 * |