EP3210466 - QUICK BRAKE ADJUST KNOB OF FISHING REEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okuma Fishing Tackle Co., Ltd. No. 11, Sec. 3 Jhongshan Road Tanzi District Taichung City 427 / TW | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Liang-Jen c/o Okuma Fishing Tackle Co., Ltd. No. 11, Sec. 3, Jhongshan Rd. Tanzi Dist. 427 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
Liao, Ching-Po c/o Okuma Fishing Tackle Co., Ltd. No. 11, Sec. 3, Jhongshan Rd. Tanzi Dist. 427 Taichung City / TW | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16161573.7 | 22.03.2016 | [2017/35] | Priority number, date | TW20160202766 | 26.02.2016 Original published format: TW 105202766 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3210466 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01, A01K89/033, A01K89/027 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A01K89/01 (EP,US);
A01K89/057 (US);
A01K89/03 (EP,US);
A01K89/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLBREMSEINSTELLUNGSKNOPF FÜR ANGELROLLEN | [2017/35] | English: | QUICK BRAKE ADJUST KNOB OF FISHING REEL | [2017/35] | French: | BOUTON DE RÉGLAGE DE FREINAGE RAPIDE DE MOULINET DE PÊCHE | [2017/35] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3604658 (NURMSE KARL, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5098032 (TODA JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 45 * * page 10, line 64 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 1, 17 *; | [A]US2003136867 (KITAJIMA KEIGO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0065] - [0068] ** figures 3, 4 * |