EP3050563 - ESTER PRO-DRUGS OF [3-(1-(1H-IMIDAZOL-4-YL)ETHYL)-2-METHYLPHENYL] METHANOL FOR TREATING SKIN DISEASES AND CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dibas, Mohammed I. 1658 Honors Circle Corona, CA 92883 / US | 02 /
Chow, Ken 20 Tidal Surf Newport Coast, California 92657 / US | 03 /
Donello, John E. 34041 Pequito Drive Dana Point, California 92629 / US | 04 /
Garst, Michael E. 2627 Raqueta Drive Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | 05 /
Gil, Daniel W. 2541 Point Del Mar Corona Del Mar, California 92625 / US | 06 /
Wang, Liming 16 Trinity Irvine, California 92612 / US | [2018/19] |
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
Dibas, Mohammed I. 1658 Honors Circle Corona, CA92883 / US | ||
02 /
Chow, Ken 20 Tidal Surf Newport Coast, California 92657 / US | |||
03 /
Donello, John E. 34041 Pequito Drive Dana Point, California 92629 / US | |||
04 /
Garst, Michael E. 2627 Raqueta Drive Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | |||
05 /
Gil, Daniel W. 2541 Point Del Mar Corona Del Mar, California 92625 / US | |||
06 /
Wang, Liming 16 Trinity Irvine, California 92612 / US | |||
Former [2016/31] | 01 /
Dibas, Mohammed I. 28871 Niguel Vista Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | ||
02 /
Chow, Ken 20 Tidal Surf Newport Coast, California 92657 / US | |||
03 /
Donello, John E. 34041 Pequito Drive Dana Point, California 92629 / US | |||
04 /
Garst, Michael E. 2627 Raqueta Drive Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | |||
05 /
Gil, Daniel W. 2541 Point Del Mar Corona Del Mar, California 92625 / US | |||
06 /
Wang, Liming 16 Trinity Irvine, California 92612 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 16161920.0 | 16.09.2011 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | US20100383370P | 16.09.2010 Original published format: US 383370 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050563 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050563 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4174, A61P27/06 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/4174 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/4164 (CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | ESTER-PRODRUGS AUS [3-(1-(1H-IMIDAZOL-4-YL)ETHYL)-2-METHYLPHENYL]METHANOL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTERKRANKUNGEN UND -STÖRUNGEN | [2016/31] | English: | ESTER PRO-DRUGS OF [3-(1-(1H-IMIDAZOL-4-YL)ETHYL)-2-METHYLPHENYL] METHANOL FOR TREATING SKIN DISEASES AND CONDITIONS | [2016/31] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS D'ESTER DE [3- (1- (1H-IMIDAZOL-4-YL) ÉTHYL) -2-MÉTHYLPHÉNYL] MÉTHANOL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ET D'AFFECTIONS DE LA PEAU | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11760961.0 / EP2616067 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | LU | 16.09.2018 | MT | 16.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MK | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
MT | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
MT | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9514007 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11* claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005034998 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * pages 9,18 *; | [A]WO2006036480 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * pages 7-10; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009089132 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * pages 14-19 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2010091209 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 7 *; | [A]WO2010093930 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - * * page 15 * * page 20; table 2 *; | [A] - GENTILI FRANCESCO ET AL, "Agonists and antagonists targeting the different alpha(2)-adrenoceptor subtypes", CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD, NETHERLANDS, (20070101), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1568-0266, pages 163 - 186, XP009153333 [A] 1-11 * pages 166-168 * | [A] - LEE V H L ET AL, "Prodrugs for improved ocular drug delivery", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0169-409X(89)90003-3, ISSN 0169-409X, (19890101), pages 1 - 38, (19890101), XP023861046 [A] 1-11 * page 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-409X(89)90003-3 | [A] - TESTA B ET AL, "DESIGN OF INTRAMOLECULARLY ACTIVATED PRODRUGS", DRUG METABOLISM REVIEWS, MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980101), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0360-2532, pages 787 - 807, XP009009563 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7491383 | WO2010093930 | - HUI, Y.-H, JOUMAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1997), vol. 762, no. 1 + 2, pages 281 - 291 | - STOILOV, "Synthesis of detomidine and medetomidine metabolites: 1,2,3-trisubstituted arenes with 4'(5')- imidazolylmethyl groups", JOUMAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 30, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/jhet.5570300631, pages 1645 - 1651, XP002372543 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570300631 | - "Synthesis of Possible Metabolites of Medetomidine {1-(2,3-dimethylphenyl)-1-[imidazol-4(5)-yl]ethane", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, SYNOPSES, (1993), pages 152 - 3 | - SALONEN ET AL., "Biotransformation of Medetomidine in the Rat", XENOBIOTICA, (1990), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 471 - 80, XP009132244 | - "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery System", T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, A.C.S. Symposium Series, vol. 14 | - PURE APPLI. CHEM., (1976), vol. 45, pages 11 - 13 | - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Salts, VERLAG HELVETICA CHEMICA ACTA-ZURICH, (2002), pages 329 - 345 |