EP3067501 - HINGE DEVICE FOR DOORS, SHUTTERS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states In & Tec S.r.l. Via Guglielmo Oberdan 1/A 25128 Brescia / IT | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACCHETTI, Luciano Via della Fonte, 9/C 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Autuori, Angelo, et al Eureka IP Consulting Via Monte Cengio, 32 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 16162529.8 | 05.04.2012 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | IT2011VI00081 | 05.04.2011 Original published format: IT VI20110081 | WO2011IB51688 | 19.04.2011 Original published format: PCT/IB2011/051688 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067501 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3067501 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/20, E05F1/12 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
E05F5/00 (EP,RU);
E05D11/02 (RU,US);
E05F1/1207 (US);
E05D11/04 (RU,US);
E05D11/084 (RU,US);
E05D11/1014 (RU,US);
E05D3/02 (RU,US);
E05F1/1223 (US);
E05F3/20 (EP,US);
E05F5/06 (EP,US);
E05D2005/108 (US);
E05D7/12 (US);
E05F3/12 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/21 (US);
E05Y2201/256 (US);
E05Y2201/264 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/628 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/638 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2016/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR TÜREN, BLENDEN ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2016/37] | English: | HINGE DEVICE FOR DOORS, SHUTTERS OR THE LIKE | [2016/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARNIÈRE POUR PORTES, VOLETS OU ANALOGUE | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 11.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12718381.2 / EP2694764 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2012 | AL | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | LU | 05.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US424614 (MORRIS J.W.) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,15 * figure - * [Y] 2,3,7 [I] 11-14; | [A]US1393889 (EMILE FRANCKAERTS) [A] 11-14* figure - *; | [YDA]WO2006025663 (I ONE INNOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [YD] 2,3,7 * abstract * [A] 8 | by applicant | GB191019477 | US1423784 | GB401858 | GB1516622 | EP0255781 | EP0407150 | WO03067011 | US2004206007 | US2004250377 | WO2006025663 | WO2006036044 | WO2007013776 | US7305797 | WO2008050989 | EP1997994 | US2009241289 | CN101705775 | EP2019895 | EP2241708 | US2011041285 |