EP3058962 - LUBRICIOUS COATING FOR MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Steven, Wayne 7684 South 2250 West West Jordan, UT 84084 / US | 02 /
Tingey, Kevin 2281 East 111620 South Sandy, UT 84092 / US | 03 /
Purdy, Robert, E 1102 E. Raymond Road Fruit Heights, UT 84037 / US | 04 /
Orr, Douglas, P 9214 Stone View Cove Sandy, UT 84093 / US | 05 /
Lee, Min-Shiu 1343 Northview Road Escondido, CA 92029 / US | [2016/34] | Representative(s) | Williams, Gareth Owen Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [2016/34] | Application number, filing date | 16162573.6 | 24.01.2002 | [2016/34] | Priority number, date | US20010263882P | 24.01.2001 Original published format: US 263882 P | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3058962 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/08, A61L29/14, A61M25/06, A61M39/04 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/085, C08L27/18 (US,EP);
A61L29/085, C08L39/06 (EP,US);
A61L29/085, C08L65/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SCHMIERENDE BESCHICHTUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2016/34] | English: | LUBRICIOUS COATING FOR MEDICAL DEVICE | [2016/34] | French: | REVETEMENT LUBRIFIANT POUR DISPOSITIF MEDICAL | [2016/34] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 03.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02704255.5 / EP1353705 | EP14163077.2 / EP2783708 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5067491 (TAYLOR II MAYLON S [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]WO9511718 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 7, line 24 - line 29; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9817331 (COOK INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]US5824049 (RAGHEB ANTHONY O [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,4-5 *; | [A]US6156435 (GLEASON KAREN K [US], et al) [A] 1-9* example 8; claims 1, 7-8 * | by applicant | US5540661 |