EP3226084 - COLOURED TIMEPIECE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turcotte, Karine 2B rue de Grandpré Boucherville, Québec J4B 4Z7 / CA | 02 /
Hämmerli, Alexandre Rue du Temple 6 2072 St-Blaise / CH | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 16162651.0 | 29.03.2016 | [2017/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226084 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3226084 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/32, A44C27/00, C23C14/12, G04B37/22, G04B45/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C23C14/12 (EP,US);
G04B45/0007 (CN,US);
G04B19/32 (EP,US);
G04B37/22 (EP,US);
G04B45/0015 (CN,US);
G04B45/0076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2017/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FARBIGE UHRENKOMPONENTE | [2017/40] | English: | COLOURED TIMEPIECE COMPONENT | [2017/40] | French: | COMPOSANT HORLOGER COLORÉ | [2017/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 02.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2016 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | IT | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | MT | 13.01.2021 | NL | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SE | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | TR | 13.01.2021 | IE | 29.03.2021 | LU | 29.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | GB | 13.04.2021 | NO | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
TR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
IT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
LU | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GB | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]FR1335336 (PHILIPS NV) [I] 9,10 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 5,11 [Y] 2,12,13; | [YA]US6538959 (YAMAGUCHI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0140]; figure 8; claim 24 *[A] 5,11; | [XAY]EP2902855 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0067] - [0069]; claims 1,2,4,9,11 * [A] 5 [Y] 2 | by applicant | EP2717103 |