EP3082065 - DUPLICATE REDUCTION FOR FACE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAKNIN, Aviva 45/3 Even Shmuel Street 9720107 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
MOSHITCH, Gal 5/17 Pinhas Rosen Street 9692519 Jerusalem / IL | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16162673.4 | 29.03.2016 | [2016/42] | Priority number, date | US201514686798 | 15.04.2015 Original published format: US201514686798 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082065 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G06V40/167 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06V20/40 (US);
G06V40/162 (US);
G06V40/171 (US);
G06V40/172 (US);
G06V40/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELTE REDUKTION ZUR GESICHTSERKENNUNG | [2016/42] | English: | DUPLICATE REDUCTION FOR FACE DETECTION | [2016/42] | French: | RÉDUCTION EN DOUBLE POUR UNE DÉTECTION DE VISAGE | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] | 09.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013148898 (MITURA MICHAEL JASON [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,8,14 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0080] *; | [IY]US2014086450 (HUANG YING-JIEH [TW], et al) [I] 1,4-7,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * [Y] 2,3,8,14; | [A] - Gary Bradski ET AL, "Chapter 7: Histograms and Matching", Learning OpenCV - Computer Vision with the OpenCV Library, Beijing [u.a.], O'Reilly, (20080101), pages 193 - 221, ISBN 978-0-596-51613-0, XP055291589 [A] 4,5 * section "Histogram Usage Examples" * * section "Back Projection" * | [A] - HSIEH CHEN-CHIUNG ET AL, "Visual people counting using gender features and LRU updating scheme", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, vol. 74, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11042-013-1715-2, ISSN 1380-7501, (20130920), pages 1741 - 1759, (20130920), XP035471004 [A] 6,15 * abstract * * section 3 * * section 4 * * sections 6.1 and 6.3 * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-013-1715-2 |