EP3078351 - TIBIAL IMPLANT FOR KNEE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonnin, Michel 27 Boulevard des Belges 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Victor, Jan Zeedijk 161 appt 8.2 8301 Knokke-Heist / BE | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnin, Michel 27 Boulevard des Belges 69006 Lyon / FR | [2017/20] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
BONNIN, Michel 27 Boulevard des Belges 69006 LYON / FR | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 16162769.0 | 30.03.2016 | [2016/41] | Priority number, date | FR20150053003 | 08.04.2015 Original published format: FR 1553003 | [2016/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078351 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3078351 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TIBIALIMPLANTAT FÜR KNIEPROTHESE | [2016/41] | English: | TIBIAL IMPLANT FOR KNEE PROSTHESIS | [2016/41] | French: | IMPLANT TIBIAL POUR PROTHÈSE DE GENOU | [2016/41] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2016 | AL | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | MT | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5964808 (BLAHA J DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 24 - line 46 * * figure 13 *; | [A]US2010016976 (SIEBEL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0008] * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2004006393 (BURKINSHAW BRIAN [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2013245777 (JERRY GERALD J [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0037] * * figure 8 * |