EP3079106 - SELECTING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING ACTIONS USING GOALS AND OBSERVATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeepMind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states DeepMind Technologies Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaul, Tom Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | 02 /
Horgan, Daniel George Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | 03 /
Gregor, Karol Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | 04 /
Silver, David Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | [2021/47] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
SCHAUL, Tom Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | ||
02 /
HORGAN, Daniel George Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | |||
03 /
GREGOR, Karol Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | |||
04 /
SILVER, David Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 9TQ / GB | Representative(s) | Martin, Philip John Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [2022/23] |
Former [2016/41] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16164072.7 | 06.04.2016 | [2016/41] | Priority number, date | US201562143677P | 06.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562143677 P | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3079106 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3079106 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3079106 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N20/00 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06N3/084 (CN);
G06N20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/04 (CN);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N99/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/41] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2016/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSWAHL VON AKTIONEN DES VERSTÄRKUNGSLERNENS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ZIELEN UN BEOBACHTUNGEN | [2021/46] | English: | SELECTING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING ACTIONS USING GOALS AND OBSERVATIONS | [2016/41] | French: | SÉLECTION D'ACTIONS D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR RENFORCEMENT UTILISANT DES OBJECTIFS ET DES OBSERVATIONS | [2021/46] |
Former [2016/41] | AUSWAHL VON BESTÄRKENDEN LERNMASSNAHMEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ZIELEN UND BEOBACHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/41] | ACTIONS D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR RENFORCEMENT DE SÉLECTION UTILISANT DES OBJECTIFS ET DES OBSERVATIONS | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2021 | 16.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Frederick L Crabbe ET AL, "Goal Directed Adaptive Behavior in Second-Order Neural Networks: The MAXSON family of architectures", Adaptive Behavior, Thousand Oaks, CA, doi:10.1177/105971230000800204, (2000), pages 149 - 172, URL: http://journals.sagepub.com/doi/pdf/10.1177/105971230000800204, (20170214), XP055346179 [I] 1-15 * Sections 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/105971230000800204 | [A] - VOLODYMYR MNIH ET AL, "Human-level control through deep reinforcement learning", NATURE, United Kingdom, (20150225), vol. 518, no. 7540, doi:10.1038/nature14236, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 529 - 533, XP055283401 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14236 | [A] - THAM C K ED - FERRÁNDEZ JOSÉ MANUEL PAZ FÉLIX DE LA LOPE JAVIER DE, "Reinforcement learning of multiple tasks using a hierarchical CMAC architecture", ROBOTICS AND AUTONOMOUS SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0921-8890(95)00005-Z, ISSN 0921-8890, pages 247 - 274, XP004001928 [A] 1-15 * Section 6 and 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-8890(95)00005-Z | [A] - JUNFEI QIAO ET AL, "Q-learning Based on Neural Network in Learning Action Selection of Mobile Robot", AUTOMATION AND LOGISTICS, 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (200708), ISBN 978-1-4244-1531-1, pages 263 - 267, XP031138775 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [IP] - TOM SCHAUL ET AL, "Universal Value Function Approximators", VOLUME 37: PROCEEDINGS OF THE 32ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MACHINE LEARNING, (20150711), XP055344798 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - SUTTON; RICHARD S; MODAYIL; JOSEPH; DELP; MICHAEL; DEGRIS; THOMAS; PILARSKI; PATRICK M, "Horde: A scalable real-time architecture for learning knowledge from unsupervised sensorimotor interaction", THE TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS AND MULTIAGENT SYSTEMS, (2011), vol. 2, pages 761 - 768 |