EP3125433 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRIGGERING PREDETERMINED OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hong Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District BEIJING 100085 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Ziguang Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District BEIJING 100085 / CN | 03 /
HOU, Enxing Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District BEIJING 100085 / CN | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Underwood, Nicolas Patrick, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16164237.6 | 07.04.2016 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | CN201510463534 | 31.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510463534 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125433 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3125433 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, G05B11/00, H04W4/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H04B1/1027 (EP,RU,US);
G05B11/00 (RU,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B17/309 (RU,US);
G05B19/418 (CN);
H04L12/2803 (EP,RU,US);
H04L12/2816 (KR);
H04L12/2823 (KR);
H04L67/125 (KR);
H04W24/10 (RU,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,CN,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSLÖSEN EINER FESTGELEGTEN OPERATION | [2017/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRIGGERING PREDETERMINED OPERATION | [2017/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉCLENCHER UNE OPÉRATION PRÉDÉTERMINÉE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 21.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2016 | AL | 16.10.2019 | AT | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | IE | 07.04.2020 | LU | 07.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.04.2016 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 07.04.2020 | ||
LU | 07.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 07.04.2020 | ||
LU | 07.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 07.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 07.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6909921 (BILGER BRENT [US]); | [A]WO2009114626 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [A]WO2010111740 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al); | [I]CN104283876 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO); | [I]CN104601204 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO); | [P]EP3001637 (XIAOMI INC [CN]) |