EP3228237 - A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING DISTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivior AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [2018/09] |
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states IROC Science to Innovation AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zakharov, Pavel In der Höh 38 8604 Volketswil / CH | 02 /
Mrochen, Michael Salomon-Landolt Weg 42 8193 Eglisau / CH | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16164472.9 | 08.04.2016 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228237 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3228237 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/028, A61B3/09, A61B3/103, A61B5/00, A61B5/06, A61B5/107, A61B5/11 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61B3/028 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B3/09 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B3/103 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B5/1072 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B5/1114 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61B5/163 (EP,IL,RU);
A61B5/168 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN VON ENTFERNUNGEN | [2017/41] | English: | A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING DISTANCES | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DISTANCE | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2016 | AL | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 25.12.2019 | |
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 25.12.2019 | |
BG | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003218721 (STERN ROGER A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] * [I] 2-5,7,10-14; | [A]US2011249237 (CHERNYAK DIMITRI [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1-5; claims 23-27 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]WO2014126307 (KT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |