EP3082263 - DIGITALLY ASSISTED CURRENT SENSE CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR DIGITIZING A SENSED SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zentrum Mikroelektronik Dresden AG Grenzstrasse 28 01109 Dresden / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STACK, David Floor 5 Riverpoint Lower Mallow Street Limerick / IE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16165025.4 | 13.04.2016 | [2016/42] | Priority number, date | DE201510105880 | 17.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015105880 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082263 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/46, // H03M1/36, H02M3/157 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP,US);
G01R19/16528 (KR);
H03M1/38 (CN,US);
G01R19/2506 (US);
G01R19/0053 (KR);
G01R19/1659 (KR);
G01R19/22 (KR);
G01R19/25 (CN);
G01R19/252 (KR);
G01R19/257 (US);
H02M3/158 (US);
H03M1/462 (EP,US);
H03M1/361 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITAL UNTERSTÜTZTE STROMMESSSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DIGITALISIEREN EINES GEMESSENEN SIGNALS | [2016/42] | English: | DIGITALLY ASSISTED CURRENT SENSE CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR DIGITIZING A SENSED SIGNAL | [2016/42] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉTECTION DE COURANT ASSISTÉ NUMÉRIQUEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE NUMÉRISATION D'UN SIGNAL DÉTECTÉ | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 09.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI] - CHAN MAN PUN ET AL, "A Monolithic Digital Ripple-Based Adaptive-Off-Time DC-DC Converter With a Digital Inductor Current Sensor", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 49, no. 8, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2014.2313567, ISSN 0018-9200, (201408), pages 1837 - 1847, (20140721), XP011554157 [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * Section II.A * * Section II.B * * Section III.A * * Section III.B * * Equations (7), (11), (13) and (15) * * figures 3,4,5,9 * [A] 6 [Y] 5,7 [I] 3,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2014.2313567 | [L] - MCCREARY J L ET AL, "AII-MOS CHARGE REDISTRIBUTION ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERSION TECHNIQUES-PART I", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (197512), vol. SC-10, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050629, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 371 - 379, XP000916718 [L] 5,7 * This document completes the disclosure of Doc #1 with respect to the implementation of a SAR ADC * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050629 | [L] - MAN PUN CHAN ET AL, "Design and Implementation of Fully Integrated Digitally Controlled Current-Mode Buck Converter", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS I: REGULAR PAPERS, IEEE, US, (201108), vol. 58, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TCSI.2011.2112531, ISSN 1549-8328, pages 1980 - 1991, XP011480669 [L] 5,7 * Section II.B;; figure 6 * * This document completes the disclosure of Doc #1 with respect to other known prior art digitally controlled DC-DC converters * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSI.2011.2112531 | [L] - SÉBASTIEN CLIQUENNOIS ET AL, "A 65-nm, 1-A Buck Converter With Multi-Function SAR-ADC-Based CCM/PSK Digital Control Loop", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (201207), vol. 47, no. 7, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2012.2191214, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1546 - 1556, XP011448469 [L] 5,7 * Section III;; figure 8 * * This document completes the disclosure of Doc #1 with respect to other known prior art digitally controlled DC-DC converters * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2012.2191214 | [Y] - HAENZSCHE STEFAN ET AL, "A 10 bit 16 MS/s redundant SAR ADC with flexible window function for a digitally controlled DC-DC converter in 28 nm CMOS", 2014 NORCHIP, IEEE, (20141027), doi:10.1109/NORCHIP.2014.7004704, pages 1 - 4, XP032715641 [Y] 5,7 * Section II * * Section III.A * * Section III.C * * Section IV * * table I * * figures 3,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NORCHIP.2014.7004704 | [A] - HUEY CHIAN FOONG ET AL, "A 0.8-[mu]W window SAR ADC with offset cancellation for digital DC-DC converters", ANALOG INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20110717), vol. 70, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10470-011-9702-X, ISSN 1573-1979, pages 133 - 139, XP019994930 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10470-011-9702-x | [A] - HUEY CHIAN FOONG ET AL, "Fast-Transient Integrated Digital DC-DC Converter With Predictive and Feedforward Control", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS I: REGULAR PAPERS, IEEE, US, (201207), vol. 59, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSI.2011.2177012, ISSN 1549-8328, pages 1567 - 1576, XP011448552 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSI.2011.2177012 | by applicant | - C. F. LEE; P. K. T. MOK ET AL., A MONOLITHIC CURRENT-MODE CMOS DC - DC CONVERTER WITH ON-CHIP CURRENT-SENSING TECHNIQUE, (2004), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 3 - 14 | - P. MIDYA; P. T. KREIN; M. F. GREUEL, "Sensorless Current Mode Control - An Observer-Based Technique for Dc-Dc Converters", TRANS. POWER ELECTRON., (2001), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 522 - 526, XP011043574 | - A. KELLY; K. RINNE, "Sensorless current-mode control of a digital dead-beat DC-DC converter", NINET. ANNU. IEEE APPL. POWER ELECTRON. CONF. EXPO. 2004. APEC '04, vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/APEC.2004.1296109, pages 1790 - 1795, XP010703502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2004.1296109 | - H. D. C. DC; M. SUPPLIES ET AL., "Lossless Current Sensing in Low-Voltage", IEEE TRANS. IDUSTRIAL ELECTRON, (2000), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 1249 - 1252, XP011023747 | - A. PRODIC; Z. LUKIC ET AL., SELF -TUNING DIGITAL CURRENT ESTIMATOR FOR LOW-POWER SWITCHING CONVERTERS, (2011), pages 529 - 534 | - H. D. C. DC; M. SUPPLIES ET AL., "Lossless Current Sensing in Low-Voltage", IEEE TRANS. IDUSTRIAL ELECTRON., (2000), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 1249 - 1252, XP011023747 |