EP3231419 - GENERATION OF DNA HYDROGELS FROM LINEAR BUILDING BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Siegen Adolf-Reichwein-Strasse 2a 57068 Siegen / DE | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nöll, Tanja Am Knippchen 2 57482 Wenden-Heid / DE | 02 /
Nöll, Gilbert Am Knippchen 2 57482 Wenden-Heid / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 16165388.6 | 14.04.2016 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231419 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, C12N15/10 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/10 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K47/6903 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON DNA-HYDROGELEN AUS LINEAREN BAUSTEINEN | [2017/42] | English: | GENERATION OF DNA HYDROGELS FROM LINEAR BUILDING BLOCKS | [2017/42] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'HYDROGELS D'ADN À PARTIR DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION LINÉAIRE | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007117177 (LUO DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * example 3 * [I] 10,14; | [XI]US2007148246 (LUO DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * example 3 * [I] 10,14; | [A]JP2007187897 (SEED CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [XI]WO2010017264 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * example 3 * [I] 10,14; | [AD] - TANJA NÖLL ET AL, "Construction of Three-Dimensional DNA Hydrogels from Linear Building Blocks", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20140625), vol. 53, no. 32, doi:10.1002/anie.201402497, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 8328 - 8332, XP055308112 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201402497 | [AD] - UM S H ET AL, "Enzyme-catalysed assembly of DNA hydrogel", NATURE MATERIALS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 5, no. 10, doi:10.1038/NMAT1741, ISSN 1476-1122, (20061001), pages 797 - 801, (20060924), XP002692004 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmat1741 | [AD] - ENJUN CHENG ET AL, "A pH-Triggered, Fast-Responding DNA Hydrogel", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20090928), vol. 48, no. 41, doi:10.1002/anie.200902538, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 7660 - 7663, XP055088426 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200902538 | [AD] - YONGZHENG XING ET AL, "Self-Assembled DNA Hydrogels with Designable Thermal and Enzymatic Responsiveness", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20101222), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:10.1002/adma.201003343, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1117 - 1121, XP055125813 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201003343 | [A] - KHIEM VAN NGUYEN ET AL, "Investigating DNA hydrogels as a new biomaterial for enzyme immobilization in biobatteries", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM., (20150101), vol. 51, no. 66, doi:10.1039/C5CC04810A, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 13071 - 13073, XP055308143 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC04810A | [A] - YOUNG HOON ROH ET AL, "Photocrosslinked DNA nanospheres for drug delivery", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS,, vol. 31, no. 13, doi:10.1002/MARC.200900872, ISSN 1022-1336, (20100701), pages 1207 - 1211, (20100525), XP002692006 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.200900872 | by applicant | - LABEAN, NATURE MATERIALS, (2006), pages 767 - 768 | - UM ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2006), pages 797 - 801 | - CHENG ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2009), pages 7660 - 7663 | - XING ET AL., ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2011), pages 1117 - 1121 | - N611 ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2014), pages 8328 - 8332 |