Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11514108 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2022 | B2 | US2019095451 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16165856 | 18.04.2016 | WO2017FI50265 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201807575 | 25.11.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | EP16165856 | 18.04.2016 | WO2017FI50265 | 12.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017182699 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16165856 | 18.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3236363 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16165856 | 18.04.2016 |