EP3130696 - WASHING MACHINE AND ANTI-PINCHING CONTROL METHOD FOR ELECTRIC DOOR THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuxi Filin Electronics Co., Ltd. International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200 Wuxi Taihu, International Science and, Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200 Wuxi Taihu International, Science and Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Dongliang International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200 Wuxi Taihu International, Science and Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | 03 /
LV, Xiaotao International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200 Wuxi Taihu International, Science and Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Xiaofeng International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200 Wuxi Taihu International, Science and Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | 05 /
TANG, Qin International Innovation Park of China Sensor Network Linghu Road No. 200, Wuxi Taihu International Science and Technology Park Jiangsu 214000 / CN | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16166395.0 | 21.04.2016 | [2017/07] | Priority number, date | CN201510492725 | 12.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510492725 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3130696 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/42, // D06F39/00, D06F39/14, D06F33/02, A47L15/42 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
D06F37/42 (EP,CN,US);
D06F33/00 (CN);
D06F2103/40 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2105/46 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE UND ANTIQUETSCHSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE TÜR DAVON | [2017/07] | English: | WASHING MACHINE AND ANTI-PINCHING CONTROL METHOD FOR ELECTRIC DOOR THEREOF | [2017/07] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PROTECTION ANTI-COINCEMENT POUR LEUR PORTE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/07] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 21.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5838125 (CHOI SSI CHOL [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - column 6, line l; figure - *; | [XI]JP2006273189 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0003]; figure - * [I] 5,6,8-10; | [I]US2006255033 (YANG FRANK [US], et al) [I] 1,3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0120] , [0121]; figures 1,14 *; | [XY]JP2008196743 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0089] - [0091] - [0112] - [0116]; figure - * [Y] 2,6-10; | [Y]US2009031634 (GLANZ MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 2,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0094] - [0096]; figures 4A,4B *; | [A]US2015005943 (BODINE DARRYL C [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract ** paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [A]US2015019017 (BODINE DARRYL C [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 16]; figure -; claims 1,20 * |