20.12.2019 |
(Expected) limited patent specification |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
11.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for limitation of patent |
|
25.11.2019 |
Request for limitation of patent allowed: despatch of communication |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Request for limitation of patent admissible |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
05.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
05.11.2019 |
New entry: Request for limitation filed |
|
04.01.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
26.01.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
15.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.01.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
08.12.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
04.07.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
04.07.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
27.06.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
18.11.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
31.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
25.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2016 |
Change - representative |
|