EP3106463 - PYRAZOLO[1,5-]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUND AS TRK KINASE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/51] | SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLO[1,5-]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AS TRK KINASE INHIBITORS | ||
[2020/04] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 22.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | (Expected) limited patent specification | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2020/04] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Julia C/O Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
ANDREWS, Steven, W. C/O Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Yutong C/O Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Gan C/O Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2016/51] | D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 16166461.0 | 21.10.2009 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | US20080107616P | 22.10.2008 Original published format: US 107616 P | [2016/51] | Previously filed application, date | EP20130197815 | 21.10.2009 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106463 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106463 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP3106463 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P29/00 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07D519/02 (IL,KR);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2016/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.06.2017 | BA | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | Title | German: | PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-VERBINDUNG ALS TRK-KINASEHEMMER | [2020/04] | English: | PYRAZOLO[1,5-]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUND AS TRK KINASE INHIBITOR | [2020/04] | French: | PYRAZOLO [1,5-] PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEUR DE KINASES TRK | [2020/04] |
Former [2016/51] | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-VERBINDUNGEN ALS TRK-KINASEHEMMERN | ||
Former [2016/51] | SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLO[1,5-]PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AS TRK KINASE INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2016/51] | PYRAZOLO [1,5-] PYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KINASES TRK | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 06.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09740245.7 / EP2350071 | EP13197815.7 / EP2725028 | Divisional application(s) | EP18151233.6 / EP3372605 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Limitations: | 29.10.2019 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 10.12.2019 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006087538 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [AD]WO2006115452 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) |