EP3100753 - CANNULA INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeQur SA Altsagenstrasse 5 6048 Horw / CH | [2017/47] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states CeQur SA Rue Igor-Stravinsky 2 Case Postale 341 1820 Montreux 2 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAVESEN, Peter Hyldebaervej 6 6430 Nordborg / DK | 02 /
ARNDT, Heiko Hafendamm 31 24937 Flensburg / DE | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16166631.8 | 14.10.2008 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | DE20071049446 | 16.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049446 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100753 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/158, A61M25/06, // A61M5/142, A61M25/02 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/3287 (US);
A61M25/0606 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14252 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KANÜLENEINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2016/49] | English: | CANNULA INSERTION DEVICE | [2016/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION DE CANULE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 07.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08840754.9 / EP2200678 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005101912 (FAUST MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 126; figures 1-52 *; | [X]EP1762259 (UNOMEDICAL AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2007093754 (MOGENSEN LASSE W [DK], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 48; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007106218 (YODFAT OFER [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 143 - page 9, paragraph 181; figures 10-18 *; | [XP]WO2008024810 (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15* page 2, paragraph 2 - page 56, paragraph 195; figures 1-43 * | by applicant | US2005165384 |