EP3104362 - METHOD FOR UPDATING DIGITAL MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom Belgium N.V. Zuiderpoort Office Park Gaston Crommenlaan 4 bus 0501 9050 Gent / BE | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERVAET, Gert De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
BEKAERT, Tim De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
CLARYSSE, Pascal De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruyterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 16166756.3 | 31.12.2009 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | US20090202585P | 16.03.2009 Original published format: US 202585 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104362 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G09B29/00, G09B29/10, G01S1/00, G01S5/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G09B29/10 (EP,US);
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01C21/3815 (EP,US);
G01C21/3841 (EP,US);
G09B29/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG VON DIGITALEN KARTEN | [2016/50] | English: | METHOD FOR UPDATING DIGITAL MAPS | [2016/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR METTRE À JOUR DES CARTES NUMÉRIQUES | [2016/50] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09806092.4 / EP2409289 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9957575 (SNAPTRACK INC [US]) [A] 1-8* page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 5 *; | [A]US2003069694 (FUCHS DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0156] *; | [I]EP1939589 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0086] *; | [A]JP2008292454 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] *; | [AD] - BRUNTRUP R ET AL, "Incremental map generation with GPS traces", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, 2005. PROCEEDINGS. 2005 IEEE VIENNA, AUSTRIA 13-16 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084, (20050913), ISBN 978-0-7803-9215-1, pages 413 - 418, XP010843059 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084 | by applicant | - BRUNTRUP, R.; EDELKAMP, S.; JABBAR, S.; SCHOLZ, B., "Incremental Map Generation with GPS Traces", PROC. 8TH INT. IEEE CONF. ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, VIENNA, AUSTRIA, (2005), doi:doi:10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084, pages 413 - 418, XP010843059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084 |