EP3210483 - RUBBER GLOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoon, Ji Yeon 111-401, 382, Gyeongin-ro Guro-gu Seoul 08275 / KR | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 16166803.3 | 25.04.2016 | [2017/35] | Priority number, date | KR20160001103U | 29.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160001103 U | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3210483 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/00 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A41D19/0082 (EP,US);
A41D19/0003 (EP,US);
A41D19/0062 (US);
A41D19/01547 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUMMIHANDSCHUH | [2017/35] | English: | RUBBER GLOVE | [2017/35] | French: | GANT EN CAOUTCHOUC | [2017/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5323490 (YARBROUGH DAN R [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 43; figure 1 *; | [A]US2014259283 (GOVINDASAMY BASKARAN [MY], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2103384 (OSER ALEJANDRO) [A] 1-3 * figure 2 *; | [X]US6427247 (SUK YOUNG J [US]) [X] 4-8 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2007067588 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 4-8 * figure 1 * |