EP3065494 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND RADIO BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 06.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Chiharu Kyocera Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8501 / JP | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16166905.6 | 27.02.2013 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | US201261604733P | 29.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261604733 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3065494 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04W72/044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND FUNKBASISSTATION | [2016/36] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND RADIO BASE STATION | [2016/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET STATION RADIO DE BASE | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13755662.7 / EP2822320 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0251037 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US2004257981 (RO JUNG-MIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007211657 (MCBEATH SEAN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * claims 1,2,15,16, *; | [X]EP1903705 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] * * claims 1-3,8,13 *; | [A]KR20080044019 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101877905 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012033636 (MCCOY JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |