EP3103452 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS OF TAXANE AND HEDGEHOG INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abraxis BioScience, LLC 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAO, Chunlin 1800 Camden Avenue Suite No. 301 Los Angeles, CA California 90025 / US | 02 /
Desai, Neil P. 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2100 Los Angeles, CA California 90025 / US | 03 /
Soon-Shiong, Patrick 149 South Barrington Avenue 311 Los Angeles, CA California 90049 / US | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 16167017.9 | 25.08.2010 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | US20090236813P | 25.08.2009 Original published format: US 236813 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103452 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K9/20 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/5169 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/42 (KR,US);
A61K31/4355 (KR,US);
A61K31/7056 (KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT NANOPARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS TAXAN UND HEDGEHOG-HEMMERN | [2016/50] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS OF TAXANE AND HEDGEHOG INHIBITORS | [2016/50] | French: | THÉRAPIE DE COMBINAISON AVEC DES COMPOSITIONS DE NANOPARTICULES DE TAXANE ET INHIBITEURS HEDGEHOG | [2016/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10812593.1 / EP2470173 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006039569 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 8-13; claims 1, 9 *; | [A] - HAWKINS ET AL, "Protein Nanoparticles as drug carriers in clinical medicine.", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY, (20080207), vol. 60, pages 876 - 885, XP002696596 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.08.044 | [A] - LOBO ET AL, "Paclitaxel albumin bound particles in combination with bevacizumab with or without gemcitabine.", BIOMEDICINE AND PHARMACOTHERAPY., (20070912), vol. 61, pages 531 - 533, XP002696597 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BIOPHA.2007.08.008 | by applicant | US5916596 | US6096331 | US6506405 | US6537579 | US6749868 | US2005004002 | US2007082838 | WO2008137148 | - RUBIN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2006), vol. 5, pages 1026 - 1033 | - BRUNTON ET AL., J. MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 1108 - 1110 | - ROMER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, pages 4975 - 4978 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2002), vol. 99, no. 22, pages 14071 - 14076 | - TAIPALE ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 892 - 897 | - TAIPALE ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 1005 - 1009 | - TULLIS, JAMA, (1977), vol. 237, pages 355 - 360,460-463 | - HOUSER ET AL., SURGERY, GYNECOLOGY AND OBSTETRICS, (1980), vol. 150, pages 811 - 816 | - FINLAYSON, SEMINARS IN THROMBOSIS AND HEMOSTASIS, (1980), vol. 6, pages 85 - 120 | - FEHSKE ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMCOL., vol. 30, pages 687 - 92 | - VORUM, DAN. MED. BULL, (1999), vol. 46, pages 379 - 99 | - KRAGH-HANSEN, DAN. MED. BULL., (1990), vol. 1441, pages 131 - 40 | - CURRY ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL, (1998), vol. 5, pages 827 - 35 | - SUGIO ET AL., PROTEIN. ENG, (1999), vol. 12, pages 439 - 46 | - HE ET AL., NATURE, vol. 358, pages 209 - 15 | - CARTER ET AL., ADV. PROTEIN. CHEM., (1994), vol. 45, pages 153 - 203 | - PAAL ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., vol. 268, no. 7, pages 2187 - 91 | - PURCELL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1478, no. A, pages 61 - 8 | - ALTMAYER ET AL., ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, (1995), vol. 45, pages 1053 - 6 | - GANIDO ET AL., REV. ESP. ANESTESTIOL. REANIM., (1994), vol. 41, pages 308 - 12 | - URIEN ET AL., INVEST. NEW DRUGS, (1996), vol. 14, no. B, pages 147 - 51 | - S. R. HINGORANI ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2005), vol. 7, page 469 |