EP3098031 - ROBOT WITH TOOLHOLDER SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proytecsa Security, S.L. Carretera Nacional, 240 Km. 134,500 22500 Binefar (Huesca) / ES | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Proytecsa Security. S.L. Carretera Nacional 240 Km. 134,500 22500 Binefar (Huesca) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALLEN ROSELLÓ, César Proytecsa Security, S.L. Carretera Nacional 240. Km. 134,5 22500 BINEFAR (Huesca) / ES | 02 /
TORRES PUEO, Roberto Proytecsa Security, S.L. Carretera Nacional 240. Km. 134,5 22500 BINEFAR (Huesca) / ES | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 16167030.2 | 26.04.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | ES20150030743 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: ES 201530743 | [2016/48] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098031 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3098031 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3098031 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B25J11/00, B25J15/04, F41H11/16, F41H11/136 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B25J11/0025 (EP);
B25J5/007 (EP,ES);
B25J15/0433 (EP);
B25J15/0475 (ES);
B25J15/0491 (EP);
B25J19/023 (ES);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | B25J5/00, B25J11/00, B25J15/04, F41H11/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROBOTER MIT WERKZEUGHALTERTRÄGER | [2016/48] | English: | ROBOT WITH TOOLHOLDER SUPPORT | [2016/48] | French: | ROBOT AVEC SUPPORT DE PORTE-OUTIL | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 04.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.09.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2016 | AL | 13.09.2017 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | IE | 26.04.2018 | LU | 26.04.2018 | MT | 26.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.04.2016 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.04.2016 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
MT | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 26.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29508794U (INST ENERGETIK UND UMWELT GGMB [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 4,5 *; | [A]WO2011128891 (AGRITECHNIQUE ENGINEERING LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 6 - page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2010068024 (AGENS MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2009044655 (DELOUIS MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]CN1804540 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2013313791 (SETRAKIAN MARK [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4545723 (CLARK KEITH H [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0538690 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |