EP3098683 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC POINT OF INTEREST SHOOTING WITH UAV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solomon Mobile Technology Limited Unit 329, 3/F, 16W, Hong Kong Science Park Shatin, N.T., Hong Kong / HK | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chien, Yu Yang Flat C, 17/F, Block 10 Grand Pacific Heights Siu Lam, N.T. Hong Kong / HK | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Izquierdo Blanco, Maria Alicia Acopat ID General Salazar, 10 48012 Bilbao / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Izquierdo Blanco, Maria Alicia Acopat, S.L. General Salazar, 10 48012 Bilbao / ES | Application number, filing date | 16167070.8 | 26.04.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | HK20150105078 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: HK 15105078 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098683 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/10, G05D1/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G05D1/0094 (EP,US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (US);
H04N23/69 (US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,US);
B64U2201/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM DYNAMISCHEN SCHIESSEN VON INTERESSENSPUNKTEN MIT UAV | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC POINT OF INTEREST SHOOTING WITH UAV | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA CAPTURE DE PHOTOS OU DE VIDEOS D'UNE POINT D'INTERÊT DYNAMIQUE AVEC UN DRONE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 01.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011114059 (FLYWAY MEDIA [FR], et al); | [XI]US2012287274 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US]); | [XI]US2012316680 (OLIVIER III CHARLES F [US], et al); | [X]WO2014200604 (GILMORE ASHLEY A [US], et al); | [XI]US2015134143 (WILLENBORG JIM [US]) |