EP3089226 - LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MODULE AND LAMP USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lextar Electronics Corp. No. 3, Gongye E. 3rd Rd. Hsinchu Science Park 30075 Hsinchu / TW | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSUEH, Fang-Chang No.76, Song 9th St., Da' an Dist. 439 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
LIN, Yu-Min 16F., No.259, Sec. 2, Sichuan Rd., Banqiao Dist. 220 New Taitei City / TW | 03 /
LIN, Chih-Hao 4F., No3, Ln. 84, Anju St., Da' an Dist. 106 Taipei City / TW | 04 /
TSAI, Tzong-Liang No.11, Ningxia E. 6th St., Xitun Dist. 407 Taichung City / TW | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Otto-von-Guericke-Ring 7 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 16167209.2 | 27.04.2016 | [2016/44] | Priority number, date | TW20150113645 | 29.04.2015 Original published format: TW 104113645 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3089226 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, H01L25/075, // F21K99/00, H01L33/36 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/15 (US);
F21K9/23 (US);
F21S2/005 (CN);
F21V3/00 (US);
G02B6/0073 (US);
H01L33/44 (CN);
H01L33/505 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21Y2101/00 (US);
F21Y2105/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTDIODENMODUL UND LAMPE DAMIT | [2016/44] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE MODULE AND LAMP USING THE SAME | [2016/44] | French: | MODULE DE DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ET LAMPE L'UTILISANT | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009115313 (LU CHIEN-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 6* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0055]; figure 3 *; | [XI]US2014091329 (LEE HSIAO-WEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 5 * [I] 3-6; | [I]EP2760047 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0058]; figures 4-7 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figures 9A, 9B *; | [A]US2014291610 (TSENG CHI-XIANG [TW], et al) [A] 3-5 * paragraph [0036]; figure 2 * |