EP3112464 - MIRNA EXPRESSION IN HUMAN PERIPHERAL BLOOD MICROVESICLES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSH, Clay B. 2266 Club Road Columbus, OH 43221 / US | 02 /
PIPER, Melissa G. - deceased / US | 03 /
ISMAIL, Noura 1616 Aschinger Boulevard Columbus, OH 4312 / US | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Campabadal Monfa, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 16167453.6 | 12.09.2008 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | US20070993809P | 14.09.2007 Original published format: US 993809 P | US20080055178P | 22.05.2008 Original published format: US 55178 P | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112464 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12Q1/68, G01N33/48 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,US);
C12N2320/12 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (CN,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2563/161, C12Q2525/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | MIRNA-EXPRESSION IN HUMANEN PERIPHEREN BLUTMIKROVESIKELN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/01] | English: | MIRNA EXPRESSION IN HUMAN PERIPHERAL BLOOD MICROVESICLES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/01] | French: | EXPRESSION DU MIRNA DANS DES MICROVÉSICULES SANGUINES PÉRIPHÉRIQUES HUMAINES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08830849.9 / EP2190992 | EP13161709.4 / EP2610342 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2016 | 30.09.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2009015357 (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X] - VALADI H ET AL, "Exosome-mediated transfer of mRNAs and microRNAs is a novel mechanism of genetic exchange between cells", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NCB1596, (20070606), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 654 - 659, XP003016816 [X] 13-15 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1596 | by applicant | - BARTEL, D.P, CEL/, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - AMBROS, V., NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 350 - 355 | - XU, P., CURR. BIOL,, (2003), vol. 13, pages 790 - 795 | - XU, P. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2003), vol. 13, pages 790 - 795 | - CHENG, A.M. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages 1290 - 1297 | - POY, M.N. ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 226 - 230 | - DRESIOS, J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 1865 - 1870 | - CALIN, G.A, PRO . NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 1554 - 15529 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11755 - 11760 | - HE, L., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 828 - 833 | - LU, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 834 - 838 | - CHEN, C.Z. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 83 - 86 | - MONTICELLI, S ET AL., GENOME BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 6, page R71 | - FELLI, N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 18081 - 18086 | - FAZI, F. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 123, pages 819 - 831 | - ZENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1327 - 1333 | - TUSCHL, NOT. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 446 - 448 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - MIYAGISHI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - LEE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECLMOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 500 - 505 | - PAUL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 505 - 508 | - BAJ-KRZYWORZEKA M; SZATANEK R; WEGLARCZYK K; BARAN 7; URBANOWICZ B; BRANSKI P; RATAJCZAK MZ; ZEMBALA M, "Tumour-derived microvesicles carry several surface determinants and mRNA of tumour cells and transfer some of these determinants to monocytes", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (2006), vol. 55, page 808818 | - RAUCH U; BONDERMAN D; BOHRMANN B; BADIMON JJ; HIMBER J; RIEDERER MA; NEMERSON Y., "Transfer of tissue factor from leukocytes to platelets is mediated by CD15 and tissue factor", BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 170 - 175 | - BLOOD, (1986), vol. 67, pages 629 - 636 | - LYBERG T; NAKSTAD B; HETLAND 0; BOYE NP, "Procoagulant (thromboplastin) activity in human bronchoalveolar lavage fluids is derived from alveolar macrophages", EUR RESPIRJ, (1990), vol. 3, pages 61 - 67 | - THIAGARAJAN P; LE A; BENEDICT CR, "Beta(2)-glycoprotein I promotes the binding of anionic phospholipid vesicles by macrophages", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASE BIOL, (1999), vol. 19, pages 2807 - 2811 | - SETZER F; OBERLE V; BLASS M; MOLLER E; RUSSWURM S; DEIGNER HP; CLAUS RA; BAUER M; REINHART K; LOSCHE W, "Platelet-derived microvesicles induce differential gene expression in monocytic cells: a DNA microarray study", PLATELETS, (2006), vol. 17, pages 571 - 576 | - PLASTERK RH, "Micro RNAs in animal development", CELL, (2006), vol. 124, pages 877 - 881 | - WILLINGHAM AT; GINGERAS TR, "TUF love for ''junk", DNA. CELL, (2006), vol. 125, pages 1215 - 1220 | - LIU CG; CALIN GA; MELOON B; GAMLIEL N; SEVIGNANI C; FERRACIN M; DUMITRU CD; SHIMIZU M; ZUPO S; DONO M, "An oligonucleotide microchip for genome-wide microRNA profiling in human and mouse tissues", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2004), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0403293101, pages 9740 - 9744, XP002364908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0403293101 | - CALIN GA; CROCE CM, "Genomics of chronic lymphocytic leukemia microRNAs as new players with clinical significance", SEMIN ONCOL, (2006), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1053/j.seminoncol.2006.01.010, pages 167 - 173, XP008092955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.seminoncol.2006.01.010 | - HEBEIT C; NORRIS K; SCHEPER MA; NIKITAKIS N; SAUK B., "High mobility group A2 is a target for miRNA-98 in head and neck squamous cell carcinoma", MOL CANCER, (2007), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1476-4598-6-5, page 5, XP021024420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-6-5 | - TAGANOV KD; BOLDIN MP; CHANG KJ; BALTIMORE D, "NF-kappaB-dependent induction of microRNA miR-146, an inhibitor targeted to signaling proteins of innate immune responses", PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A., (2006), vol. 103, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0605298103, pages 12481 - 12486, XP002544549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0605298103 |